Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.542 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1844 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4981B | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.677 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.677 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | print number 1297b | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | print number 1297a | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to health | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | referred to health |