Assembly | 12/13/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | vetoed memo.74 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.211 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4924A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.430 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | rules report cal.430 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | print number 1303a | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to children and families | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to children and families |