Assembly | 05/29/2024 | substituted by s2278a | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.144 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.144 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2024 | print number 1309b | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2024 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | print number 1309a | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |