Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.48 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.606 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1560 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2158A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | repassed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | amended on third reading (t) 1353a | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | recalled from senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.92 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.92 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to real property taxation |