Assembly | 06/25/2023 | approval memo.4 | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2023 | signed chap.140 | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.430 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S208A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.194 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | print number 1371a | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | referred to governmental operations |