Assembly | 11/17/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | vetoed memo.40 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.832 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1861 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.327 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.327 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | referred to mental health |