Assembly | 12/22/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | vetoed memo.110 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1796 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1045 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.617 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.617 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | referred to local governments |