Assembly | 05/20/2024 | substituted by s3108a | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | rules report cal.65 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2024 | print number 1577a | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to people with disabilities | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to people with disabilities |