Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted by s1196a | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.679 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | print number 1673a | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | referred to insurance |