Assembly | 10/01/2024 | signed chap.424 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1633 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2465C | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.302 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.302 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | print number 1696c | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | print number 1696b | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to insurance | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2024 | print number 1696a | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2024 | amend and recommit to insurance | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to insurance |