Assembly | 03/18/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | amended on third reading 1731a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.52 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.103 | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | reported referred to codes |