Assembly | 08/04/2023 | delivered to secretary of state | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.503 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5025 | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.47 | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | opinion referred to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2023 | to attorney-general for opinion | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2023 | print number 1771a | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2023 | reported referred to ways and means |