Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.56 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | amended on third reading 1880a | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.11 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | reported |