Senate | 04/03/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.324 | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to energy | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 1903a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to energy |