Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.634 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1797 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1082 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.210 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.210 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2023 | referred to cities |