Assembly | 09/22/2023 | signed chap.484 | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1806 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5400 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.187 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | rules report cal.187 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules |