Assembly | 01/26/2024 | approval memo.94 | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | signed chap.775 | ||
Assembly | 12/27/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1490 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5201 | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.199 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | reported referred to codes |