Assembly | 05/29/2024 | substituted by s2862a | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.147 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.147 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | print number 2121a | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to real property taxation |