Assembly | 11/17/2023 | approval memo.21 | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.635 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.367 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2294A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.142 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.142 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | print number 2134a | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | amend and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2023 | referred to housing |