Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.336 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1635 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3498 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.66 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.71 | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported |