Assembly | 11/17/2023 | approval memo.22 | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.636 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.853 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5100 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.94 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | rules report cal.94 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | reported referred to rules |