Assembly | 03/03/2023 | signed chap.65 | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.168 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2231 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.74 | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2023 | rules report cal.74 | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2023 | referred to insurance |