Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.375 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1798 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1139 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.331 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.331 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2023 | referred to local governments |