Assembly | 12/22/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | vetoed memo.115 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1668 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2672A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.488 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.488 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | print number 2307a | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | amend and recommit to education | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2023 | referred to education |