Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.376 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1799 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1580 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.434 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.434 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2023 | referred to local governments |