Assembly | 12/22/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | vetoed memo.116 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1538 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7012 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.201 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2023 | referred to small business |