Assembly | 07/25/2024 | signed chap.205 | ||
Assembly | 07/25/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.774 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1900A | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.94 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.94 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | print number 2487a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |