Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted by s253a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.232 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 2563a | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |