Assembly | 12/23/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | vetoed memo.114 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1185 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S15A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.388 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.388 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | print number 2583a | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to social services |