Assembly | 12/08/2023 | signed chap.684 | ||
Assembly | 11/29/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.520 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1839A | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.214 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.214 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 2609a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to health |