Assembly | 12/13/2023 | signed chap.723 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1450 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1048A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.491 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.491 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | print number 2672b | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 2672a | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |