Assembly | 01/31/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.76 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.193 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | rules report cal.193 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | print number 2677a | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | amend and recommit to transportation |