Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted by s6698a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | amended on third reading 2753a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | recalled from senate | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.143 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.143 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2023 | referred to ways and means |