Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.378 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.554 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3489A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.333 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.333 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | print number 2756a | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2023 | referred to real property taxation |