Senate | 01/31/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.79 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.13 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2023 | referred to health |