Assembly | 01/08/2024 | enacting clause stricken | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | recommitted to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | to attorney-general for opinion | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.80 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.683 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.683 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reference changed to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2023 | opinion referred to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2023 | referred to environmental conservation |