Assembly | 11/17/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | vetoed memo.43 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1391 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6596 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.194 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | rules report cal.194 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2023 | referred to environmental conservation |