Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.460 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1833 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4199 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.81 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.160 | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | reported |