Assembly | 06/07/2023 | substituted by s5621b | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | amended on third reading (t) 2873b | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | RECOMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | recalled from senate | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.764 | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5621A | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.107 | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | rules report cal.107 | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2023 | print number 2873a | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2023 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2023 | referred to governmental operations |