Assembly | 12/11/2024 | approval memo.22 | ||
Assembly | 12/11/2024 | signed chap.548 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1910 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5481A | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.84 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.437 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.437 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 2898a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to insurance |