Assembly | 10/13/2023 | signed chap.522 | ||
Assembly | 10/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.281 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3364A | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.14 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2023 | referred to economic development |