Assembly | 05/03/2023 | signed chap.52 | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.587 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4002 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.114 | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | rules report cal.114 | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2023 | referred to ways and means |