Assembly | 05/03/2023 | signed chap.55 | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.716 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4005C | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | message of necessity - 3 day message | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.125 | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | rules report cal.125 | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2023 | print number 3005c | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2023 | print number 3005b | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2023 | print number 3005a | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2023 | referred to ways and means |