Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 12/27/2023 | print number 3020b | ||
Assembly | 12/27/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | print number 3020a | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | referred to health |