Assembly | 12/22/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | vetoed memo.117 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.744 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5826 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.34 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | reported |