Assembly | 10/25/2023 | approval memo.14 | ||
Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.544 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.491 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3497 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.163 | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | referred to judiciary |