LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A03113
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A03113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A03113
Action History
Assembly
06/07/2023
substituted by s3609b
Assembly
03/23/2023
advanced to third reading cal.74
Assembly
03/21/2023
reported
Assembly
03/03/2023
print number 3113a
Assembly
03/03/2023
amend and recommit to health
Assembly
02/02/2023
referred to health