Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.305 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.305 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | amended on third reading 3119a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.86 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.105 |