Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s2852a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.557 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.557 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to economic development | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2023 | print number 3132a | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2023 | amend and recommit to economic development |