Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.638 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.626 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5889 | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.112 | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | rules report cal.112 | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | print number 3172a | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |